Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 07:11:05 (UTC).

MARPLES, MARILYN VS. CASTANON, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 03/29/2002 MARPLES, MARILYN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASTANON, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0130

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARPLES MARILYN

Defendants

CASTANON RICHARD

PAGE JULIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ELLA M. MURPHY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/17/02 . FOR (MARPLES, MARILYN) . AGAINST (CASTANON, RICHARD) , (PAGE, JULIE) , ALL UNNAMED TENANTS . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1602 ALAMITAS AVE., MONROVIA, CA 91016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 28.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI439479001 . MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS $16.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF ELLA M. MURPHY (MAIL) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT: NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. SUBMITTED ON 04/11/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CASTANON, RICHARD) . COSTS OF $ 16.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PAGE, JULIE) . COSTS OF $ 16.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CASTANON, RICHARD) , (PAGE, JULIE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI478057001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 05/13/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less