Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 17:09:01 (UTC).

MACSAN TRADING CORP. VS GNS FASHION, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2004 MACSAN TRADING CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GNS FASHION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARY BOUNDS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7312

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARY BOUNDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACSAN TRADING CORP.

Defendant

GNS FASHION INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (GNS FASHION, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 , HON. GARY BOUNDS,COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/01/04 . FOR (MACSAN TRADING CORP.) . AGAINST (GNS FASHION, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 2729.90 . COSTS $ 52.00 . TOTAL $ 2781.90 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GNS FASHION, INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/01/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC452782008. HEARING SET FOR 12/01/04 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Macsan International Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GNS FASHION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GLAM is a litigant