This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:13:38 (UTC).

LOPEZ, ROBERT VS. GAULKE, JOSSELYN PAIGE

Case Summary

On 05/26/2005 LOPEZ, ROBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GAULKE, JOSSELYN PAIGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are H. JAY FORD, LAWRENCE MIRA, TERRY ADAMSON and LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0087

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

H. JAY FORD

LAWRENCE MIRA

TERRY ADAMSON

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ ROBERT

LOPEZ VICTOR

Defendants

GAULKE JOSSELYN PAIGE

GAULKE PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSIN & ASSOCIATES - ANITA D. ROSIN ESQ

Attorney at ROSIN & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

CLASEN, RAFFALOW & RHOADS - PERRY M. FORRESTER

Attorney at CLASEN, RAFFALOW & RHOADS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (LOPEZ, ROBERT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED A SETTLMENT. OSC IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: DUE TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT LOPEZ NOT BEING IN COURT CASE IS SET FOR OSC RE: SANCTIONS 10-15-07 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 3. . THE CLAIMS AS TO VICTOR LOPEZ HAVE BEEN SETTLED AND A DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED. . THE TRIAL DATE OF 8-20-07 IS VACATED. . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2007
  • JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY (GAULKE, JOSSELYN PAIGE) , (GAULKE, PAUL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (LOPEZ, VICTOR) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2007
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF TRIAL RETURNED AS TO (LOPEZ, ROBERT) DUE TO FORWARD TIME EXP RTN TO SEND .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2007
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. 003 . PER JUDGE MIRA CASE IS SET IN DEPT 3 FOR JURY TRIAL 8-20-07.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GAULKE, JOSSELYN PAIGE) , (GAULKE, PAUL) . RECEIPT # MAL136401002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2005
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (GAULKE, JOSSELYN PAIGE) , (GAULKE, PAUL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GAULKE, PAUL) SUBSERVICE . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GAULKE, JOSSELYN PAIGE) SUBSERVED . COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 05/31/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.