Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 21:13:56 (UTC).

LOPEZ, MANUEL VS. FLORES, JOSE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2002 LOPEZ, MANUEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES, JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0365

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ MANUEL

Defendant

FLORES JOSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 23.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI439479009 . {COUNTER}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO MANUAL LOPEZ (OUT BOX) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT: SECTION 6 INCORRECT. SIGNATURE MUST BE A NON-PARTY MEMBER OVER 18 YEARS. SUBMITTED ON 10/04/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FLORES, JOSE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/07/02 . FOR (LOPEZ, MANUEL) . AGAINST (FLORES, JOSE) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 924 HURSTVIEW ST., DUARTE, CA 91010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO MANUAL LOPEZ (OUT BOX) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT: ORIGINAL SUMMONS REQUIRED. SECTION 6 OF THE DEFAULT IS INCORRECT AND INCOMPLETE. *IF REQUESTING A JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND MONEY, YOU MUST SUBMIT THE PROPER DOCUMENTS. {INSTRUCTIONS FOR DEFAULT ATTACHED} SUBMITTED ON 10/03/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, NOTICE OF COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER), COPIES OF EXHIBIT 1,2,3,4 FILED. SERVED AS TO (FLORES, JOSE) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI478057002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 11/07/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (LOPEZ, MANUEL) FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE - IF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON A DEFENDANT IS PERFORMED, A DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IS REQUIRED. SECTION 3A IS INCORRECT (PERSONAL SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANT WAS NOT PERFORMED). SECTON 3B5 IS INCOMPLETE AND SECTION 3C SUBMITTED ON 09/24/02

    Read MoreRead Less