This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2016 at 10:22:23 (UTC).

LEGACY PARTNERS VS. INCERA, ANGELA M.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2000 LEGACY PARTNERS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against INCERA, ANGELA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0029

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGACY PARTNERS

Defendant

INCERA ANGELA M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN - HELAINE ASHTON

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2005
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/27/05 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2000
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO ANGELA M INCERA AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ANGELA M. INCERA . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 27.36 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/07/00 . FOR LEGACY PARTNERS . AGAINST ANGELA M. INCERA . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3834 N ORCHID LANE #E, CALABASAS, CA 91302 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RN CLB445385009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2000
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CLB445385005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2000
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGACY PARTNERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S