This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 02:06:38 (UTC).

LEE, MARY VS. PAYNE, CHASE

Case Summary

On 11/26/2001 LEE, MARY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAYNE, CHASE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0945

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE MARY

Defendant

PAYNE CHASE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MCALLISTER & GLOVER - JON-RENE M. GLOVER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MCALLISTER & GLOVER

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL S. MISCHEL & ASSOCIATES - AARON C. HOWE ESQ

Attorney at MICHAEL S. MISCHEL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 0.57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # SNI439479006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2002
  • NOTICE OF ARBITRATION HEARING FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/28/02 AT 03:00P M, AT THE FOLLOWING LOCATION: 701 N. BRAND BLVD. SUITE 600 GLENDALE 91203 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER REFERRED TO ARBITRATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO ARBITRATION SIGNED, FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR: GINA M WEIHERT , ESQ. FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 07/09/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • NOTICE OF POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2002
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • ANSWER FILED OF CHASE PAYNE . RECEIPT # SNI478057008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT & NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE FILED. SERVED AS TO (PAYNE, CHASE) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 02/26/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less