This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2016 at 20:01:55 (UTC).

Lee, Heesook Park Vs. Oh, Boo Ja

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Lee Heesook Park against Oh Boo Ja in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4825

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Steven B.kotulak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee Heesook Park

Defendant

Oh Boo Ja

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # 279625003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 , HON. STEVEN B.KOTULAK,JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/16/01 . FOR (LEE, HEESOOK PARK) . AGAINST (OH, BOO JA) . PRINCIPAL $ 790.00 . COSTS $ 27.00 . TOTAL $ 817.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (OH, BOO JA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2001
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (OH, BOO JA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (OH, BOO JA) . RECEIPT # 279625038 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625038. HEARING SET FOR 04/16/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 006.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.