Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 07:30:14 (UTC).

LAMPKINS, FONDA VS. GONZALEZ, ANTONIO C.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2004 LAMPKINS, FONDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GONZALEZ, ANTONIO C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3577

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMPKINS FONDA

Defendant

GONZALEZ ANTONIO C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DROCIAK, YEAGER & ASSOCIATES - KENNETH C. YEAGER

Attorney at DROCIAK, YEAGER & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

SILVA, CLASEN AND RAFFALOW - HENRY L. HEINS III

Attorney at SILVA, CLASEN AND RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/30/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • NOTICE RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RSPONSES TO JUDICIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BEING TAKEN OFF CALENDAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS. . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. MOVING PARTY TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND DECLARATION OF KENNETH C. YEAGER; FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES SET FOR 04/22/05 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT F IS ADVANCED TO THIS DATE AND CONTINUED TO 04/26/05 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT F AT 1725 MAIN STREET SANTA MONICA CA 90401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS SERVED UPON PLAINTIFF , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # CUL462301004 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/26/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL INTERROGATORIES . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL INTERROGATORIES SET FOR 04/22/05 IN DEPARTMENT F IS ADVANCED TO THIS DATE AND CONTINUED TO 04/26/05 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT F AT 1725 MAIN STREET SANTA MONICA CA 90401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL INTERROGATORIES , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # CUL462301005 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/26/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS SERVED UPON PLAINTIFF; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FONDA LAMPKINS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # CUL462301004 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/22/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • CASE SENT TO SANTA MONICA RM 116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (GONZALEZ, ANTONIO C.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GONZALEZ, ANTONIO C.) . RECEIPT # CUL462301004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (GONZALEZ, ANTONIO C.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, ANTONIO C.) . COSTS OF $ 42.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL462301003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 02/15/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/18/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 11/19/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH