This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 09:00:39 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL CO.,INC. VS. RADCO MANUFACTURING CO.,INC.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2001 L A COMMERCIAL CO ,INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RADCO MANUFACTURING CO ,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0189

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.A. COMMERCIAL CO. INC. A CORPORATION DBA CONTINENTAL CO

Defendants

MACGREGOR WARREN D. AKA MACGREGOR WARREN

RADCO MANUFACTURING CO. INC. A CORPORATION AKA RADCO MFG.CO.INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - CAROL R. HAMILTON

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED IN FULL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN LUIS OBISPO COUNTY. 3814.11 ORIGINALS THRU ATTORNEY'S SERVICES . RECEIPT # 235352018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # ELA235352017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2001
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 7000.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 14.55 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • ORDER ALLOWING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/23/01 . FOR (L.A. COMMERCIAL CO.,INC.) A CORPORATION, DBA (CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP) . AGAINST (RADCO MANUFACTURING CO.,INC.) A CORPORATION AKA (RADCO MFG.CO.INC.) , (MACGREGOR, WARREN D.) AKA (MACGREGOR, WARREN) . PRINCIPAL $ 9599.91 . ATTY. FEES $ 660.00 . INTEREST $ 394.65 . COSTS $ 138.00 . TOTAL $ 10,792.56 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. A CORPORATION DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (RADCO MANUFACTURING CO.,INC.) A CORPORATION AKA (RADCO MFG.CO.INC.) , (MACGREGOR, WARREN D.) AKA (MACGREGOR, WARREN) ON 03/29/01 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 138.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585{D} CCP FILED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 ON 04/18/01 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (RADCO MANUFACTURING CO.,INC.) A CORPORATION AKA (RADCO MFG.CO.INC.) , (MACGREGOR, WARREN D.) AKA (MACGREGOR, WARREN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (RADCO MANUFACTURING CO.,INC.) A CORPORATION AKA (RADCO MFG.CO.INC.) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELA135956003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less