This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2016 at 19:33:02 (UTC).

L A Close Out Inc Vs. Sharbel, Haboud

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by L A Close Out Inc against Sharbel Haboud in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4597

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Linda P. Elliott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L A Close Out Inc

Defendant

Sharbel Haboud

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. LINDA P. ELLIOTT, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SHARBEL, HABOUD) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/17/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 006 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625007. HEARING SET FOR 04/17/01 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 006.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.