Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:26:24 (UTC).

KEY BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS. DIALLO, MAMADOU

Case Summary

On 02/05/2004 KEY BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIALLO, MAMADOU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0391

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEY BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

DIALLO MAMADOU AKA MAMADOU DIALLO S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP - BRIAN N. WINN

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/31/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (KEY BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) FOR REJECTION OF PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED. THIS MATTER WAS REVIEWED BY THE COURT AND YOUR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (SEE LETTER ATTACHED) SUBMITTED ON 03/30/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO COMM. RALPH AMADO RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DIALLO, MAMADOU) AKA (MAMADOU, DIALLO S.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT AND ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (DIALLO, MAMADOU) AKA (MAMADOU, DIALLO S.) . COSTS OF $ 22.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/06/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/06/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/05/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEY BANK OF CENTRAL MAINE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINN BRIAN N. ESQ.