This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 08:31:39 (UTC).

KENNETH MANAGEMENT GROUP VS PALMER, ERNESTINE J

Case Summary

On 12/29/2005 KENNETH MANAGEMENT GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PALMER, ERNESTINE J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1175

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH MANAGEMENT GROUP

Defendant

PALMER ERNESTINE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, ANDREA N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2006
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 07/25/06. RESPONDENT TO RECOVER COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2006
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD - FINAL DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2006
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT RE APPEAL (DESIGNATION) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • BENCH OFFICER NOTIFIED FOR APPEAL NO. --001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • COURT TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • COURT TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2006
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2006
  • JUDGMENT TENTATIVELY GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2006
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2006
  • ORDER TO POST SIGNED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • APPLICATION & ORDER TO POST SUMMONS RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENNETH MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, ANDREA N