This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 17:06:30 (UTC).

Kendall, Thomas E. Vs. Billing, Ron

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Kendall Thomas E against Billing Ron in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0476

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendall Thomas E.

Defendant

Billing Ron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2005
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL RETURNED AS TO (BILLING, RON) DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • PURSUANT TO 581 C.C.P , THE COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED AND FILED; COPY MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN POM207126003. HEARING SET FOR 04/17/01 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 006.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.