This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2016 at 10:28:12 (UTC).

KAUFMAN, MELISSA VS. GOLDEN WEST YACHTS INTERNATION

Case Summary

On 01/13/2005 KAUFMAN, MELISSA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOLDEN WEST YACHTS INTERNATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RALPH AMADO and YIFAT HASSID. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0050

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RALPH AMADO

YIFAT HASSID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAUFMAN MELISSA

Defendants

NATHANSON RICHARD

GOLDEN WEST YACHTS INTERNATIONAL INC.

FREEMAN WALLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/29/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. WET , HON. YIFAT HASSID PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: AGREEMENT RECEIVED FROM (KAIFMAX, MELISSA) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (GOLDEN WEST YACHTS INTERNATIONAL,INC.) . RICHARD NATHANSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RALPH AMADO COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 04/08/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. WET . TRIAL TO BE HELD IN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FREEMAN, WALLY) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/23/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (KAIFMAX, MELISSA) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 02/23/05 AT 01:30P M. IN DIV. 003 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2005
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NATHANSON, RICHARD) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/22/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN CUL404216038. HEARING SET FOR 02/22/05 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (NATHANSON, RICHARD) , (FREEMAN, WALLY) . RECEIPT # CUL404216007 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.