Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 05:30:02 (UTC).

KALT, SAM VS. SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2004 KALT, SAM filed an Other lawsuit against SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2736

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KALT ILONA

KALT SAM

Defendants

SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES INC.

FLORES ROBERT JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BERT L ROGAL - BERT L. ROGAL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BERT L ROGAL

LAW OFFICES OF BERT ROGAL - BERT L. ROGAL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BERT ROGAL

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARCUS M. BAUKOL - JULIUS WACHS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARCUS M. BAUKOL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/17/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR AND THE OSC IS DISCHARGED. DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED ON 3-23-05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/07/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (KALT, SAM) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. WEQ . SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE, 1725 MAIN STREET, SANTA MONICA, CA 90401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • COURTHOUSE CLOSURE/CASE TRANSFER/RESCHEDULE NOTICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • NOTICE OF RULING/CLERKS MINUTE ORDER RETURNED AS TO LAW OFFICES OF BERT L. ROGAL DUE TO ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO 03/22/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 . RECEIPT # N/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2004
  • DOCUMENTS RECEIVED AND FILED ON RECLASSIFIED CASE FROM THE SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE OF THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, BEARING CASE# SC081714.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2004
  • NOTICE OF RECEIPT ON TRANSFER CASE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 09/14/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES INC. is a litigant