This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 07:37:46 (UTC).

JONES & JONES MANAGEMENT, INC. VS. SAVAGE, RAY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2004 JONES JONES MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAVAGE, RAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES & JONES MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

Defendants

STRICKLAND LATISHA

SAVAGE RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (SAVAGE, RAY) , (STRICKLAND, LATISHA) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/20/04 , FOR (JONES & JONES MANAGEMENT, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORP. , AGAINST (SAVAGE, RAY) , (STRICKLAND, LATISHA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3995 HILLCREST DRIVE #6, LOS ANGELES, CA 90008 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 22.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL210902001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/05/04 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL481447003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONES & JONES MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.