Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 09:33:40 (UTC).

JB GROUP III VS. HECK, RODERICK D. AKA RODERICK

Case Summary

On 03/22/2004 JB GROUP III filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HECK, RODERICK D AKA RODERICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH AMADO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0875

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH AMADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JB GROUP III L.L.C.

Defendants

HECK RODERICK D. AKA RODERICK HECK

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - RICHARD GRAHAM ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2004
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RALPH AMADO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT LODGED. . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/11/04 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2004
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 04/20/04 AT 10:30A M., IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (HECK, RODERICK D.) . RECEIPT # CUL481477006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/21/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less