Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:24:53 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE VS. LUPO, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 02/03/2004 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUPO, THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0375

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EX

Defendants

LUPO THOMAS

LUPO KHRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON, BAMBRICK, CERMAK & FAIR - CYNTHIA WINTER

Attorney at RICHARDSON, BAMBRICK, CERMAK & FAIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/31/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB), AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. PLEASE CHECK TO MAKE SURE THIS IS THE CORRECT CASE NUMBER, AND TITLE OF PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANTS SUBMITTED ON 06/13/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 09/27/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/12/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 08/12/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 07/16/04 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB), AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 05/20/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL319437009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/06/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/03/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant