This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:49:08 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE VS. HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON

Case Summary

On 11/07/2012 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1228

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EX

Defendant

HARRIS SHAWANDA LASHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN - JAMES H. AGUIRRE

Attorney at RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 12/28/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 01/28/13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C01228 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 5863.57 . RECEIPT # 278865040 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 1000.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2869.27 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 11/07/12 , FOR (INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB), AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE , AGAINST (HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 2964.30 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 2869.27 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 5,863.57 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 11/07/12 W/SAME CASE #02C01228 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 02/27/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB), AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE , RECEIPT NO. BH490068016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PLAINTIFF (INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB), AN INTERIN BAR NUMBER AND ATTORNEY NAME: 105855-26 STEVEN J. HORN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: OF JOHN BARON RE:PROOF OF DAMAGES, PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 585(D) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO [CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTION 585 (D)] FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033(B) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2003
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON) ON 01/30/03 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 124.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HARRIS, SHAWANDA LASHON) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH000300014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/02 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WBH . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 07/19/02

    Read MoreRead Less