This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 14:53:42 (UTC).

Interinsurance Exchange Of The Vs. Gutierrez, Maria Delacruz

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Interinsurance Exchange Of The against Gutierrez Maria Delacruz in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0515

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club An Interinsurance Ex

Defendant

Gutierrez Maria Delacruz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/14/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 04/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM POM01C00515 TO LAM01CR0515

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORRSP. DESK RE: MISC. WORK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CANDIE RE: CORR DESK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOE 1 THROUGH 30, ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO PATTY RE: P.O.S AND SUMMONS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, DELAY REDUCTION RULES, STATUS CONFERENCE QUSTONNAIRE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUTIERREZ, MARIA DELACRUZ) . COSTS OF $ 47.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM207126002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/10/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.