This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 19:36:31 (UTC).

HOUSEHOLD BANK SB, N.A. VS. RAZO, SALVADOR

Case Summary

On 02/15/2000 HOUSEHOLD BANK SB, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAZO, SALVADOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0204

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSEHOLD BANK SB N.A.

Defendant

RAZO SALVADOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT T. HARRIS - ROBERT T HARRIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT T. HARRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2011
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/29/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2000
  • DocketORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AGAINST (RAZO, SALVADOR) SIGNED AND FILED. DAVID SOTELO. COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2000
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S). RML(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2000
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 003 FOR CONSIDERATION EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT, AN ORDER. RML .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2000
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. (A)RML . RN PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2000
  • DocketEXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE SUM OF $ 4675.65 . (A)RML . RN PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2000
  • DocketORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL SUMMONS SIGNED BY DAVID SOTELO AND FILED. RML(A) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2000
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2000
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT. PLTF. APPEARING BY DEC. CCP 585(D). NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFT. RML(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2000
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2000
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/27/00 . FOR (HOUSEHOLD BANK SB, N.A.) . AGAINST (RAZO, SALVADOR) . PRINCIPAL $ 3842.50 . ATTY. FEES $ .00 . INTEREST $ 716.15 . COSTS $ 110.00 . TOTAL $ 4,668.65 . RML(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2000
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: SECTION 585(D) CCP RECEIVED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION RML .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2000
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE RML(A) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (RAZO, SALVADOR) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 110.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. RML(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (RAZO, SALVADOR) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2000
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN 235366015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLD BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS, ROBERT T.