This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 17:45:28 (UTC).

HOMEOWNERS EQUITY CORPORATION VS. MORRISON, DAVID W.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2001 HOMEOWNERS EQUITY CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORRISON, DAVID W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0151

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMEOWNERS EQUITY CORPORATION

Defendants

TAQUINO RAYMOND SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2

MORRISON DAVID W.

FRENCH KIM SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ENDCRES AND ESTLE - DAVID R. ENDRES

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ENDCRES AND ESTLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2002
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2001
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED UPDATED OF (MORRISON, DAVID W.) , (FRENCH, KIM) SUED HEREIN AS (DOE 1) , DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/17/01 . FOR (HOMEOWNERS EQUITY CORPORATION) . AGAINST (MORRISON, DAVID W.) , (FRENCH, KIM) SUED HEREIN AS (DOE 1) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 2538 GRAYDON AVENUE, MONROVIA, CA 91016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 15.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2001
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI478057008 . SHERIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2001
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF ENDRES AND ESTLE (U.S. MAIL) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: JUDGMENT MUST BE VACATED IN ORDER TO ENTER DISMISSAL. SUBMITTED ON 05/16/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF DAVID R. ENDRES {MAIL) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT: NO PROOF OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED AS TO DAVID W. MORRISON. SUBMITTED ON 05/10/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED INSERTING IN PLACE AND STEAD OF FICTITIOUS NAME DOE 1 THE TRUE NAME OF KIM FRENCH .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FRENCH, KIM) SUED HEREIN AS (DOE 1) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TAQUINO, RAYMOND) SUED HEREIN AS (DOE 2) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . SERVED TO KIM FRENCH. COSTS $30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2001
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FRENCH, KIM) SUED HEREIN AS (DOE 1) , (TAQUINO, RAYMOND) SUED HEREIN AS (DOE 2) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. SERVICE AS TO THE NOTICE TO OCCUPANTS TO VACATE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING RETURNED AS TO (MORRISON, DAVID W.) DUE TO FORWARDING TIME EXPIRED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # SNI478057006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketNEXT ACTION DUE 06/07/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMEOWNERS EQUITY CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA DISSOLVED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF ENRES AND ESTLE - DAVID R ENDRES