This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 07:16:30 (UTC).

HINDS, ROBERT VS. ELLISON, CARROLL A.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2002 HINDS, ROBERT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ELLISON, CARROLL A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0148

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HINDS ROBERT

HINDS CAROL

Defendants

ELLISON CARROLL A.

ELLISON MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF LIDDLE AND LIDDLE - LAYNE L. LIDDLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LIDDLE AND LIDDLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2002
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/24/02 . FOR (HINDS, ROBERT) , (HINDS, CAROL) . AGAINST (ELLISON, CARROLL A.) , (ELLISON, MONICA) , ALL UNNAMED TENANTS . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 241 EAST WALNUT AVENUE, MONROVIA, CA 91016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 36.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI478057001 . MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2002
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ELLISON, CARROLL A.) , (ELLISON, MONICA) , ALL UNNAMED TENANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 171.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 05/24/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF LIDDLE AND LIDDLE - LAYNE L. LIDDLE