This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2016 at 10:12:25 (UTC).

HDL ACCEPTANCE CORP. VS. ZEA, HUGO OMANA

Case Summary

On 05/16/2001 HDL ACCEPTANCE CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZEA, HUGO OMANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES M. HODGES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1264

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES M. HODGES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HDL ACCEPTANCE CORP.

Defendants

ZEA MAYLETH H.

ZEA HUGO OMANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/08/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINAL GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF. . RECEIPT # CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:12A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JAMES M. HODGES, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING REP. JIM NEELANDS . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT. (BOTH DEFENDANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/03/01 . FOR (HDL ACCEPTANCE CORP.) . AGAINST (ZEA, HUGO OMANA) , (ZEA, MAYLETH H.) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 75.00 . TOTAL $ 2575.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ZEA, HUGO OMANA) , (ZEA, MAYLETH H.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ZEA, MAYLETH H.) BY SUB-SERVING MAYLETH ZEA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/03/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ZEA, MAYLETH H.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/03/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 . COSTS OF $ 15.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2001
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 08/03/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ZEA, HUGO OMANA) , (ZEA, MAYLETH H.) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELA446805036. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 06/22/01 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less