This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2016 at 10:35:24 (UTC).

Handel, Susan Vs. Thelen, Quentin

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Handel Susan against Thelen Quentin in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0911

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Handel Susan

Defendant

Thelen Quentin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • CASE FILE STORED IN BOX #14 SET FOR DESTRUCTION ON 05/03/02 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. DES . TO BE DESTROYED ON 050302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SBA043981010. HEARING SET FOR 04/25/01 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (THELEN, QUENTIN) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/25/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 008 . COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.