This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2016 at 20:44:58 (UTC).

HADJIANIAN, JACK VS. DELORME, ROSA

Case Summary

On 04/26/2000 HADJIANIAN, JACK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DELORME, ROSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0344

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HADJIANIAN JACK

FULLER DENNIS

Defendant

DELORME ROSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/19/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2000
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2000
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2000
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. (C)RML GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER . RN PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2000
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO JACK HADJIANIAN FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION, THERE IS NO JUDGMENT AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, NEED TO CHANGE LINE 9A1 OF BACK OF WRIT FORM. CHECK #'S 5085 AND 7086 RETURNED. DOCUMENTS RETURNED VIA MAIL. RML SUBMITTED ON 05/30/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2000
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR. TRIAL HELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2000
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2000
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2000
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/30/00 . FOR (HADJIANIAN, JACK) , (FULLER, DENNIS) . AGAINST (DELORME, ROSA) . PAST DUE RENT $ .00 . DAILY DAMAGES $ 900.00 . ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 . COSTS $ 94.00 . TOTAL $ 994.00 . AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 746 BRADY AVE, LOS ANGELES, CA 90022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2000
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2000
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2000
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 05/30/00 AT 09:00A M., IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2000
  • DocketAPPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (DELORME, ROSA) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2000
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS RML .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2000
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO ROSALINDA DELORE AKA ROSALINDA RIOS SUED AS ROSA DELORME ANSWER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2000
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (DELORME, ROSA) . RN WAIVED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2000
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2000
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 235366010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less