This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2016 at 07:08:50 (UTC).

Guadalajara Jewelers Inc. Vs. Ortega, Neisy

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Guadalajara Jewelers Inc against Ortega Neisy in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0594

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Lorraine Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guadalajara Jewelers Inc.

Defendant

Ortega Neisy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/07/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELA01S00594 TO ALH01SE0594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:21A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LORRAINE ANDERSON, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING REP. ELVIA DIAZ . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/18/01 . FOR (GUADALAJARA JEWELERS INC.) . AGAINST (ORTEGA, NEISY) . PRINCIPAL $ 359.98 . COSTS $ 65.00 . TOTAL $ 424.98 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ORTEGA, NEISY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ORTEGA, NEISY) BY SUB-SERVING JORGE MONINA, ROOMMATE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELA446805017. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/01 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.