Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 09:50:11 (UTC).

GREYSTONE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC VS. RIVERS, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 04/05/2004 GREYSTONE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RIVERS, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1039

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREYSTONE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. A CALIF. CORP.

Defendants

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

RIVERS ROCHELLE

RIVERS ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL462301004 . P/U BASKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 18.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY JEFFREY M. WINTER, ESQ . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 07/07/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (RIVERS, ROBERT) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (RIVERS, ROBERT) . RECEIPT # 985(I)CRC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (RIVERS, ROBERT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV003 RE: FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/05/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREYSTONE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.