This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2016 at 04:03:22 (UTC).

GREENHUT, JORDAN R. VS. PEDRO, JOSE

Case Summary

On 04/24/2003 GREENHUT, JORDAN R filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEDRO, JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN and JOE W. HILBERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1620

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

JOE W. HILBERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENHUT JORDAN R.

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

PEDRO TOMAS

PEDRO JOSE

CAYABYAB TERA LEANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GARY B. TORPY - GARY B. TORPY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY B. TORPY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARSHA MUNEMURA - STEVEN P. BROWN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARSHA MUNEMURA

LAW OFFICE OF BEVERLY I MILLS - BEVERLY I MILLS ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BEVERLY I MILLS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2005
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/22/05 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTY OF PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RETURNED. THE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 012604. SUBMITTED ON 02/05/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND CLERKS NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (GREENHUT, JORDAN R.) ATTORNEY DUE TO ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2004
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/15/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketNOTICE RE: SETTLEMENT WITH CONDITIONAL DISSMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2004
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2003
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CAYABYAB, TERA LEANN) . COSTS OF $ 90.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOE W. HILBERMAN, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE: COMPLIANCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS SATISFIED AND PLACED OFF CALENDAR THE PREVIOUSLY SET NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW HEARING SET FOR 9-25-03 STANDS. THE PARTIES ARE TO COMPLY BY FILING THEIR STATEMENTS. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (PEDRO, JOSE) , (PEDRO, TOMAS) . CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT (PEDRO, JOSE) , (PEDRO, TOMAS) . CROSS-DEFENDANT (CAYABYAB, TERA LEANN) . RECEIPT # 404216001-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2003
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PEDRO, JOSE) , (PEDRO, TOMAS) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2003
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOE W. HILBERMAN, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE: COMPLIANCE: . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 8-4-03 AT 8:30AM IN DIV. 1 TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO SERVE THE DEFENDANT. IF THE PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED PRIOR TO THE HEARING, NO APPEARANCE WILL BE NEEDED. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2003
  • DocketMATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 08/04/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . OSC RE: COMPL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL481447001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/24/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/25/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORPY GARY B. LAW OFFICES OF