This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:53:08 (UTC).

GRANT & WEBER VS. GREENE-HILL, WANDA L.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2005 GRANT WEBER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GREENE-HILL, WANDA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1202

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT & WEBER A CORPORATION

Defendants

GREENE-HILL WANDA L. AKA GREENE MAURICE MRS.

GREENE MAURICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - REID L. STEINFELD

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/27/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GRANT & WEBER) A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT. PLEASE COMPLY WITH THE PREVIOUS REJECT LETTER. THE CLERK CANNOT AWARD ATTORNEY FEES, IF THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT DOES NOT PROVIDE FOR ATTORNEY FEES. THE COURT CAN AWARD ATTORNEY FEES ON AN OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT, SO SUBMITTED ON 08/23/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GREENE-HILL, WANDA L.) AKA (GREENE, MAURICE, MRS.) ON 06/28/05 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 227.30 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GRANT & WEBER) A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT. AS STATED IN THE PREVIOUS REJECT LETTER, THE CLERK CANNOT AWARD ATTORNEY FEES IF THEY ARE NOT PROVIDED FOR IN THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT. CIVIL CODE SECTION 1717.5 STATES, ATTORNEY FEES 'SHALL BE FIXED BY THE COURT' SUBMITTED ON 07/28/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GREENE-HILL, WANDA L.) AKA (GREENE, MAURICE, MRS.) , (GREENE, MAURICE) ON 06/28/05 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 227.30 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (GRANT & WEBER) A CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GRANT & WEBER) A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT. THE CLERK CANNOT AWARD ATTORNEY FEES, IF THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT DID NOT PROVIDE FOR ATTORNEY FEES. PLEASE SUBMIT A DECLARATION EXPLAINING LOSS/DESTRUCTION/ UNAVAILABILITY OF ORIGINALS AND A PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE SUBMITTED ON 06/28/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GREENE-HILL, WANDA L.) AKA (GREENE, MAURICE, MRS.) , (GREENE, MAURICE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GREENE-HILL, WANDA L.) AKA (GREENE, MAURICE, MRS.) . COSTS OF $ 36.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GREENE, MAURICE) . COSTS OF $ 36.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500206008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/23/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/09/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WEQ . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/25/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.