This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:16:20 (UTC).

GRANT & WEBER VS. BLACK, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2005 GRANT WEBER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLACK, STEVEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0114

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT & WEBER A CORPORATION

Defendants

BLACK ROBERTA AKA BLACK BOBBIE AKA B

BLACK STEVEN AKA BLACK STEVEN EARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - REID L. STEINFELD

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/07/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2005
  • NOTICE RE: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2005
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED. RECEIPT # MAL136401010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GRANT & WEBER) A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE SUBMITTED 9/6/05. PLAINTIFF PHONED SAYING DEFENDANT IS PAYING AND THAT THEY WISH TO WITHDRAW PACKAGE AND HAVE IT RETURNED VIA AMERICAN LEGAL SUPPORT ATTORNEY SERVICE. PLACED IN ATTORNEY PICK-UP BOX SUBMITTED ON 09/06/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (BLACK, ROBERTA) AKA (BLACK, BOBBIE) AKA (BLACK, MRS. STEVEN) . COSTS OF $ 36.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (BLACK, STEVEN) AKA (BLACK, STEVEN EARL) . COSTS OF $ 41.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/23/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.