This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:15:06 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, RUBIN VS. SILBA, SAUL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2005 GONZALEZ, RUBIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SILBA, SAUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1010

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ RUBIN

Defendants

SILBA SAUL

CASIANO CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE C. CRUZ - LAWRENCE CRUZ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE C. CRUZ

Defendant Attorney

RICHARDSON, BAMBRICK, CERMAK & BENNETT - KIMBERLY L MAXWELL

Attorney at RICHARDSON, BAMBRICK, CERMAK & BENNETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • MATTER SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON 04/16/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MEDIATION/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MEDIATION HELD. CASE DID NOT SETTLE. A 3-4 DAY JURY TRIAL IS SET FOR 4-16-07, AT 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT WE-F. TRIAL SETTING ORDER IS FILED THIS DATE. NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • TRIAL SETTING ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • PLAINTIFF'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF, RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • DEFENDANT'S SETTLEMENT BRIEF, RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT D RE: MEDIATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: STATUS CONFERENCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • CASE IS REFERRED TO ARBITRATION BY COURT ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (SILBA, SAUL) AND PLAINTIFF RUBIN GONZALES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SILBA, SAUL) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SILBA, SAUL) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (CASIANO, CARMEN) . RECEIPT # SM000900003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SILBA, SAUL) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM00900030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/04/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.