This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2016 at 08:04:50 (UTC).

GIBI LLC VS LADEZMA, KARINA

Case Summary

On 10/08/2002 GIBI LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LADEZMA, KARINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5999

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIBI LLC

Defendants

VILLA NICHOLAS

LADEZMA KARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAST, GARY PRESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2013
  • ***CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVT. CODE 68151 - 68153***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2002
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2002
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less