Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2016 at 16:47:49 (UTC).

GCFS VS. JABER, JALAL A.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2004 GCFS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JABER, JALAL A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0414

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

JABER JALAL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS, INC. - HUSHING-KLINE, BRIGHTON

Attorney at LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 218.00 FILED BY (GCFS), INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 6525.35 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 5843.87 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 11C02357 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • PURSUANT TO A RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED ON THIS CASE AND ALL PAPERS HAVING BEEN PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER, THEREFORE, THE OLD CASE JACKET WAS DESTROYED ON 08/10/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GCFS), INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT. AS YOU WERE INFORMED IN THE REJECTION DATED 07/11/11 THE AMOUNT OF INTEREST YOU ARE REQUESTING IS TOO HIGH. THE DECLARATION THAT YOU HAVE SUBMITTED VERY CONFUSED AND THE SUBMITTED ON 07/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GCFS), INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT. THE INTEREST YOU ARE REQUESTING IS TOO HIGH. PLEASE SEE THE ATTACHED INTEREST CALCULATION. SUBMITTED ON 07/08/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 4194.63 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST (LINES 16 & 17). $ .00 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST (LINE 19) $ .00 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT (LINE 15).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 5731.02 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (JABER, JALAL A.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: PLAINTIFF'S EXEMPTION FROM USURY LIMITATIONS OF CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTION ARTICLE XV, SECTION 1 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; STATEMENT OF LOCATION; NOTICE OF CASE MGMT REVIEW; NEW RULES OF THE COURT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JABER, JALAL A.) . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 08/16/04 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/04 AT 02:00P M, IN DIV/DEPT. TCM . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/02/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI019482005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less