This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2016 at 04:19:02 (UTC).

GATZ, IVAN VS. LAUGHLIN, MARTA

Case Summary

On 04/01/2005 GATZ, IVAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAUGHLIN, MARTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0020

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GATZ IVAN AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS AN ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

LAUGHLIN MARTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DALE VAN CAMP - DALE VAN CAMP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DALE VAN CAMP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GARY W. KEARNEY - GARY W. KEARNEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY W. KEARNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • CASE ORDERED TRANSFERRED TO HILL ST COURT FOR CONSOLIDATION WITH CASE NO. BC331275 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2005
  • COURT DISQUALIFIES ITSELF DUE TO CONFLICT. MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: POSSESSION IS NO LONGER AN ISSUE. DEFENDANT HAS FILED NOTICE OF A RELATED ACTION: BC331275 GATZ VS. LAGUHLIN, FILED APRIL 4, 2005 NEXT HEARING 11/17/2005 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 62 AT 111 NORTH HILL STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90012 FOR FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE. . THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THAT DEPARMTMENT FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF RELATED STATUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (LAUGHLIN, MARTA) FOR REJECTION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BECAUSE ANY EX PARTE MATTER IS FILED AND HEARD ON THE SAME DAY. FEES ARE ALSO NEEDED UPON FILING SUBMITTED ON 07/20/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2005
  • NOTICE TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S ATTENDANCE AT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • TENDER OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING ON GENERAL DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2005
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (LAUGHLIN, MARTA) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 06/13/05 AT 08:30A M IN DIV. 003 . RECEIPT # MAL136401005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • NOTICE RE: RELATED CASE (CRC 804) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAUGHLIN, MARTA) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAUGHLIN, MARTA) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET; CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAUGHLIN, MARTA) . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT ON MOBILE HOME FILED. RECEIPT # MAL472266015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/01/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.