Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 14:01:47 (UTC).

FRELO, JAMES C. VS. HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 04/30/2002 FRELO, JAMES C filed an Other lawsuit against HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0400

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRELO JAMES C. AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

HOME DEPOT A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILL D. JOHNSON - WILL D. JOHNSON ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WILL D. JOHNSON

Defendant Attorney

DE SIMONE & HUXSTER - HUXSTER, PETER K.

Attorney at DE SIMONE & HUXSTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2003
  • NOTICE TO BOOKKEEPER ISSUED RE: JURY FEES TO BE APPLIED TO STATE COURT TRIAL FUND .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2003
  • JURY FEES POSTED BY DEFENDANT (TRANSFERRED FROM PASADENA) , AMOUNT $150.00 , IN TRUST. RECEIPT # SNI439479006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • NOTICE TO BOOKKEEPER ISSUED RE: JURY FEES RECEIVED FROM PASADENA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2003
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 04/10/03 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR JURY TRIAL. PURSUANT TO TELEPHONE CALL FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL . SETTLEMENT REACHED. JURY TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 03/26/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2003
  • JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY (FRELO, JAMES C.) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2003
  • PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE TO THE JURY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (HOME DEPOT) A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY WILL D. JOHNSON . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY PETER K. HUXSTER . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: PURSUANT TO STIPULATION BY PARTIES, THE MATTER IS DEEMED AT ISSUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON 02/25/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. {BY PLAINTIFF}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. {BY DEFENDANT}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2002
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2002
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/20/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • DOCUMENTS ON TRANSFER RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS HAV BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE PASADENA SUPERIOR COURT, CASE #GC027220: COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/01 NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT PROOF OF SERVICE STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE MINUTES ENTERED 08/08/01 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER MINUTES ENTERED 11/08/01 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR PARTY NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL JURY FEE TRACKING SLIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • ***CONTINUED*** MINUTES ENTERED 02/08/02 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO AWARD OF ARBITRATOR MINUTES ENTERED 02/19/02Q MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY CERTIFIED COPY OF MINUTES ENTERED 04/23/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD OF TRANSFER FILED. NEW CASE NUMBER 02C00400 .

    Read MoreRead Less