This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 11:35:24 (UTC).

FREE, SCOTT VS. SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH

Case Summary

On 01/13/2005 FREE, SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0096

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREE SCOTT

Defendants

SELINGER HENRY M.

SELINGER ISAAC HERSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KEVING T. BARNES - KEVIN T BARNES

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KEVING T. BARNES

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON, DILANDO AND WHITAKER - JACK M. LIEBHABER

Attorney at ROBINSON, DILANDO AND WHITAKER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/02/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • CASE IS REFERRED TO ARBITRATION BY COURT ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (FREE, SCOTT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • ORDER APPOINTING (SELINGER,HENRY M.) AS THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH) , SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH) , (SELINGER,HENRY M.) . RECEIPT # SM481447009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • PETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF (SELINGER,HENRY M.) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH) , RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. WEA FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH) , (SELINGER,HENRY M.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 05/05/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SELINGER, ISAAC HERSH) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SELINGER,HENRY M.) . COSTS OF $ 10.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/21/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/24/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/13/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.