This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2019 at 06:25:55 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. VAKNIN, ASHER

Case Summary

On 11/05/2012 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against VAKNIN, ASHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2304

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

VAKNIN ASHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.I.R., L.L.P. - DANIEL KODAM ESQ

Attorney at C.I.R., L.L.P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (VAKNIN, ASHER) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 12/24/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 01/24/13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C02304 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 17258.89 . RECEIPT # 451225002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PLAINTIFF (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) BAR NUMBER AND ATTORNEY NAME: 099073-86 MICHAEL J MIXER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 8417.70 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 11/05/12 , FOR (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) , AGAINST (VAKNIN, ASHER) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 8811.19 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 8417.70 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 17,258.89 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 11/05/12 W/SAME CASE #02C02304 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/14/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2004
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2003
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # 278865016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2003
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE:USE OF IMAGED ORIGINALS (CCP 585(D) & EC 1550) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (VAKNIN, ASHER) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CASE ASSIGNMENT, CASE MANAGMENT, ETC FILED. SERVED AS TO (VAKNIN, ASHER) SERVED EVAN SANCHEZ, PERSON IN CHARGE . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, NTC TO ATTY ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION FILED. SERVED AS TO (VAKNIN, ASHER) LEAVING COPIES WITH EVAN SANCHEZ, PERSON IN CHG, MAIL ALSO . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH278865004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WBH . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 11/19/02

    Read MoreRead Less