Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:35:42 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. PRASAD, RAJESH

Case Summary

On 02/17/2004 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRASAD, RAJESH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0491

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendants

PRASAD RAJESH

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CREDITOR IUSTUS ET REMEDIUM, LLP CIR,LLP - PETER MOUND

Attorney at CREDITOR IUSTUS ET REMEDIUM, LLP CIR,LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/31/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 09/23/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PRASAD, RAJESH) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (PRASAD, RAJESH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 485132003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/19/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/17/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant