Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 15:38:17 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. JUAREZ, ABELARDO

Case Summary

On 05/11/2001 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUAREZ, ABELARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0547

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

JUAREZ ABELARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CREDITOR IUSTUS ET REMEDIUM, L.L.P. - DANIEL KODAM ESQ

Attorney at CREDITOR IUSTUS ET REMEDIUM, L.L.P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2004
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 45.00 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST (LINES 16 & 17). $ .00 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST (LINE 19) $ 510.16 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT (LINE 15).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2004
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY. 20930.72 ORIGINALS THRU ATTORNEY SERVICES -EDP- . RECEIPT # CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 4019.87 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED FILED; NO SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINAL FORWARDED TO ATTORNEY SERVICE . RECEIPT # EAL135956025 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # ELA135956005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2001
  • ORDER RE: COPIES SIGNED AND FILED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2001
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2001
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 003 FOR CONSIDERATION ' .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (JUAREZ, ABELARDO) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 138.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 THRU 10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: USE OF IMAGED ORIGINALS (EC 1550) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JUAREZ, ABELARDO) . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELA235352023.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREDITOR IUSTUS ET REMEDIUM, L.L.P. - DANIEL KODAM ESQ