This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 08:20:35 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. HERNANDEZ, MARTIN

Case Summary

On 02/05/2001 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0140

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

HERNANDEZ MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN & REESE - HARLAN M. REESE

Attorney at MORGAN & REESE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • ORDER FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR{S} (HERNANDEZ, MARTIN) FILED. U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDERS THAT THE ABOVE NAMED DEBTOR{S} IS RELIEVED FROM ALL DISCHARGABLE DEBTS; AND ANY JUDGMENT OBTAINED HEREIN OR HEREAFTER IS NULL AND VOID. CASE D 01-11007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2002
  • LETTER SENT TO DEFENDANTS RE: REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2002
  • PERSONAL LETTER FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION FOR BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING FILED AFTER JUDGMENT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS. 01-11007-JH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # ELA00215009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • ORDER ALLOWING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/11/01 . FOR (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) . AGAINST (HERNANDEZ, MARTIN) . PRINCIPAL $ 7129.17 . ATTY. FEES $ 770.00 . INTEREST $ 589.87 . COSTS $ 152.00 . TOTAL $ 8,641.04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES ONLY. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (HERNANDEZ, MARTIN) ON 04/09/01 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 152.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585{D} CCP FILED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 ON 04/09/01 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (HERNANDEZ, MARTIN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 135956012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harlan M Reese