This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2019 at 06:25:40 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. DIXON, STEVE D.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2012 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DIXON, STEVE D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1545

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

DIXON STEVE D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN & REESE ATTORNEYS AT LAW - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT

Attorney at MORGAN & REESE ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (DIXON, STEVE D.) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 10/03/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 11/05/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C01545 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 5146.17 . RECEIPT # 535206009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF INTEREST & RENEWED JUDGMENT AMOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2516.78 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • BY MAIL PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS TO (DIXON, STEVE D.) . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 09/14/12 , FOR (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) , AGAINST (DIXON, STEVE D.) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 2599.39 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 2516.78 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 5,146.17 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 09/14/12 W/SAME CASE #02C01545 JUDGMENT RENEWED ,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 26.00 FOR CERTIFIED COPIES. RECEIPT # 535206010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (DIXON, STEVE D.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DIXON, STEVE D.) ON 01/06/03 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 130.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MORGAN & REESE, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORTATION FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT 585 (D) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (DIXON, STEVE D.) . COSTS OF $ 36.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 490189011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WBH . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/27/02

    Read MoreRead Less