This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 18:31:22 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company Vs. Cordero, Arnulfo

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Ford Motor Credit Company against Cordero Arnulfo in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0658

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company

Defendant

Cordero Arnulfo Aka Cordero Guevara Arnulfo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 09C04728 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • PURSUANT TO A RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED ON THIS CASE AND ALL PAPERS HAVING BEEN PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER, THEREFORE, THE OLD CASE JACKET WAS DESTROYED ON 11/09/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2759.64 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO HARLAN M. REESE FOR REJECTION OF WRIT, DEBTOR NAME AND AKA MUST BE ON WRIT. COURT WILL HOLD FEE OF $7.00 FOR REFILING. MGH SUBMITTED ON 10/06/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. (M) DK . RECEIPT # 200000016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 368.88 .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2001
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/23/01 . FOR (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) . AGAINST (CORDERO, ARNULFO) AKA (CORDERO, GUEVARA ARNULFO) . PRINCIPAL $ 10923.49 . ATTY. FEES $ 1100.00 . INTEREST $ 520.16 . COSTS $ 146.00 . TOTAL $ 12,689.65 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2001
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO 00A RE: COURT JUDGMENT AND ORDER. JR. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CORDERO, ARNULFO) AKA (CORDERO, GUEVARA ARNULFO) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES ONLY. JR. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2001
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DON HILL FILED RE: SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER RE: EVIDENCE CODE, SECTION 1553. JR. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (CORDERO, ARNULFO) AKA (CORDERO, GUEVARA ARNULFO) , BY LEAVING ALFONSO GONZALEZ, CO-OCCUPANT, A COMPETENT MEMBER OF THE HOUSEHOLD. . P.F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00A . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 450749008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.