This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2019 at 06:24:30 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY VS. BAGNALL, JULIA

Case Summary

On 11/19/2012 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BAGNALL, JULIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1849

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY

Defendant

BAGNALL JULIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES - TODD A. MACDOWELL

Attorney at MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C01849 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 7854.84 . RECEIPT # 278865022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 3848.79 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 11/19/12 , FOR (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) , AGAINST (BAGNALL, JULIA) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 3976.05 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 3848.79 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 7,854.84 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 11/19/12 W/SAME CASE #02C01849 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/07/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2003
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # BH278865001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/07/03 . FOR (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) . AGAINST (BAGNALL, JULIA) . PRINCIPAL $ 3239.44 . ATTY. FEES $ 284.37 . INTEREST $ 306.24 . COSTS $ 146.00 . TOTAL $ 3,976.05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 006 FOR CONSIDERATION COURT JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/25/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/24/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BAGNALL, JULIA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BAGNALL, JULIA) ON 02/19/03 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 146.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (C.C.P. 585(D),1033 ) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CASE ASSIGNMENT, NOTICE TO LITIGANTS FILED. SERVED AS TO (BAGNALL, JULIA) . COSTS OF $ 52.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 278865008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WBH . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/22/02

    Read MoreRead Less