This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 12:11:04 (UTC).

FLORENCE APARTMENTS VS. GRIMALDI, LIDIA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2005 FLORENCE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRIMALDI, LIDIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0275

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORENCE APARTMENTS

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

DE PAZ MILTON

GRIMALDI LIDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - FREDERICK L. SPINRAD

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 02/14/05 . FOR (FLORENCE APARTMENTS) . AGAINST (GRIMALDI, LIDIA) , (DE PAZ, MILTON) , (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3463 W. FLORENCE AVE., APT. 4, LOS ANGELES, CA 90043 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 19.80 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED VIA U.S. MAIL . RECEIPT # CUL474108007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . COSTS OF $ 20.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • NOTICE RE: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANCE WITH C.C.P. 415.46 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED & DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GRIMALDI, LIDIA) , (DE PAZ, MILTON) ON 02/03/05 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/22/05 AT 08:30P M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.