This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 01:47:29 (UTC).

FIRST SELECT CORPORATION VS. CASTLE, JEREMIAH JOHN

Case Summary

On 03/24/2000 FIRST SELECT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTLE, JEREMIAH JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0375

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST SELECT CORPORATION ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO: C

Defendant

CASTLE JEREMIAH JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN, LLP - IRWIN J. ESKANOS

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/26/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (CASTLE, JEREMIAH JOHN) , RECEIPT NO. ELA457745022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO CREDIGY RECEIVABLES, INC. -C/O ESKANOS & ADLER, P.C. 2325 CLAYTON RD., CONCORD, CA. 94520 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1264.67 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 340.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINAL RETURNED TO ATTORNEY SERVICE . RECEIPT # ELA235356022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 327.20 .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2001
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED. $ 28.00 , ALLOWED ON OR AFTER 07/23/01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2000
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # 00C00375 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2000
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. PLTF. AND DEFT. BOTH APPEARING PER WRITTEN STIPULATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2000
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2000
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/01/00 . FOR (FIRST SELECT CORPORATION) . AGAINST (CASTLE, JEREMIAH JOHN) . PRINCIPAL $ 1459.08 . ATTY. FEES $ 210.00 . INTEREST $ 51.11 . COSTS $ 120.00 . TOTAL $ 1,840.19 . RML(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2000
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RECEIVED FROM 000215-003 . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION. . RN PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2000
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMLIANT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CASTLE, JEREMIAH JOHN) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2000
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 235366015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Select, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN BRACKEN LLP - IRWIN J. ESKANOS