This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 09:55:59 (UTC).

Farmers Insurance Exchange Vs. Valle, Manuel Robles

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange against Valle Manuel Robles in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0267

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Defendant

Valle Manuel Robles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/19/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM NEW01C00267 TO LAM01CK0267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2001
  • CERTIFICATE OF FACTS AND CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. . RECEIPT # NEW136370005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # NEW482931023 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2001
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMISSIONER THOMAS R. WHITE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/06/01 . FOR (FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE) . AGAINST (VALLE, MANUEL ROBLES) . PRINCIPAL $ 19660.31 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 1266.87 . COSTS $ 126.00 . TOTAL $ 21,053.18 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (VALLE, MANUEL ROBLES) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST CALCULATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585{D} CCP FILED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 004 ON 06/05/01 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO STANLEY H. GETZ, ESQ. FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT - YOUR DEFAULT REQUEST IS PREMATURE. THE DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/08/01 TO FILE A RESPONSE. SUBMITTED ON 05/01/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (VALLE, MANUEL ROBLES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW285283017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.