This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 11:21:03 (UTC).

FARHOOD JR., WILLIAM N. VS. PROMO DART, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2005 FARHOOD JR , WILLIAM N filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROMO DART, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FARHOOD JR. WILLIAM N.

BF DATACOM INC.

Defendants

PROMO DART INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNETH P. KOURY ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS G. GEHRING - THOMAS G. GEHRING

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS G. GEHRING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/04/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCES. CASE SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 12/05/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 12/05/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2005
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO 09/22/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. WEF . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 07/18/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (PROMO DART, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (FARHOOD JR., WILLIAM N.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. THE DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER ON 02/02/05. SUBMITTED ON 02/07/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PROMO DART, INC.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: OF LOST SUMMONS AFTER SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (PROMO DART, INC.) . RECEIPT # CUL488416003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL474108009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/10/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/03/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.