Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 07:48:19 (UTC).

FAIRLANE CREDIT VS. MERCADO, MARICELA

Case Summary

On 12/16/2004 FAIRLANE CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERCADO, MARICELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. REID and LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3764

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN H. REID

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRLANE CREDIT LLC

Defendant

MERCADO MARICELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A MACDOWELL

Attorney at MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/18/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS. . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 9-2-05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: MOTION OF 8/14/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • NOTICE RE: STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING OF 9/14/05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 9-14-05, AT 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT WE-F TO BE HEARD WITH THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 437(C) CCP, SUPPORTING DECLARATION(S), POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED. RECEIPT # SM000900033 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/14/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • ORDER DENYING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (MERCADO, MARICELA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) HAVE TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MERCADO, MARICELA) . RECEIPT # 985(I)CRC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (MERCADO, MARICELA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MERCADO, MARICELA) . COSTS OF $ 29.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 02/25/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 12/16/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A. MACDOWELL