Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2016 at 13:19:10 (UTC).

ESTATE LIQUIDATION SERVICES, I VS. BLEEKER, ALESIA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2002 ESTATE LIQUIDATION SERVICES, I filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLEEKER, ALESIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0283

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE LIQUIDATION SERVICES INC.

Defendants

BLEEKER ALESIA

MOORE KEVIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING ROWEMONT GARRETT . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 3650 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. PLAINTIFF ONLY (DEFENDANT NOT SERVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2002
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (MOORE, KEVIN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY ROWEMONT GARRETT . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET THE HEARING IS GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2002
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/10/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO ALESIA BLEEKER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SNI439479001. HEARING SET FOR 05/06/02 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DAMAGES FOR DISHONORED CHECK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (BLEEKER, ALESIA) . RECEIPT # SNI439479001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MOORE, KEVIN) . RECEIPT # SNI439479001 .

    Read MoreRead Less